TX HB2645 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the election of certain junior college district trustees by plurality vote.
Title
Relating to the election of certain junior college district trustees by plurality vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
Elections
Elections--General
LAREDO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT
SOUTHWEST TEXAS JUNIOR COLLEGE DISTRICT
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
Elections
Elections--General
LAREDO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT
SOUTHWEST TEXAS JUNIOR COLLEGE DISTRICT