TX HB2644 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of qualified employee for purposes of the enterprise zone program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of qualified employee for purposes of the enterprise zone program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1314 (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1272 (Y: 121 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2023-05-11SenateRead first time
2023-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2023-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1314
2023-05-09HousePassed
2023-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1272
2023-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2023-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-13HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2023-03-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB733 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB733 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback