TX HB2640 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to grand jury proceedings; providing a penalty for contempt of court.
Title
Relating to grand jury proceedings; providing a penalty for contempt of court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2640 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02640I.htm |