TX HB2637 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the urban air mobility advisory committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the urban air mobility advisory committee.

Sponsors

Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]
Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Gary Gates [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]
Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Ann Johnson [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]
Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]
Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]
Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2021-05-11HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 763
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB763 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback