TX HB2632 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to notice by certain managed care entities of changes related to reimbursements applicable to certain physicians and health care providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to notice by certain managed care entities of changes related to reimbursements applicable to certain physicians and health care providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-06SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1795 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback