TX HB2630 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to physician and health care provider directories for certain health benefit plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to physician and health care provider directories for certain health benefit plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#745 (Y: 87 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#745
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-24HouseAmended 1-J.E. Johnson
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1742 (Same As) 2019-05-17 - House passage as amended reported

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback