TX HB2630 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to physician and health care provider directories for certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to physician and health care provider directories for certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#745 (Y: 87 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#745 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended 1-J.E. Johnson |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1742 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19