TX HB2624 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of certain criminal offenses involving fraud.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of certain criminal offenses involving fraud.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#721 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#721
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback