TX HB2622 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of subpoenas or certain other court orders with respect to an online service provider in the investigation or prosecution of certain criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of subpoenas or certain other court orders with respect to an online service provider in the investigation or prosecution of certain criminal offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-09HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback