TX HB2618 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the maternal mental health peer support pilot program for perinatal mood and anxiety disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the maternal mental health peer support pilot program for perinatal mood and anxiety disorder.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2301 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback