TX HB2616 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the discipline and behavior management of a student enrolled in a grade level below grade three at a school district or open-enrollment charter school.
Title
Relating to the discipline and behavior management of a student enrolled in a grade level below grade three at a school district or open-enrollment charter school.
Sponsors
Rep. Helen Giddings [D] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] |
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--School Districts
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--School Districts
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING