TX HB2615 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the licensing of towing operators and vehicle storage facility employees by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the licensing of towing operators and vehicle storage facility employees by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#676 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]


2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-24HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-03-21HouseRead first time


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments