TX HB2611 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to broker agreements for the sale of real property by school districts.
Title
Relating to broker agreements for the sale of real property by school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#520 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--School Districts
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
REAL ESTATE BROKERS
Education--School Districts
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
REAL ESTATE BROKERS