TX HB2609 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to advance directives or health care or treatment decisions made by or on behalf of patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to advance directives or health care or treatment decisions made by or on behalf of patients.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-28HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB917 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback