TX HB2605 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contracts for certain professional services and the distribution of certain consultants' reports.
Title
Relating to contracts for certain professional services and the distribution of certain consultants' reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-08 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |