TX HB260 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a cross-border motor vehicle traffic congestion web portal.
Title
Relating to the creation of a cross-border motor vehicle traffic congestion web portal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Amended RV#235 (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#235 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Amended 1-Blanco |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-08 | House | Postponed 4/9/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-04 | House | Postponed 4/8/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
MEXICO
TEXAS A&M TRANSPORTATION INSTITUTE
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
MEXICO
TEXAS A&M TRANSPORTATION INSTITUTE
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous