TX HB2593 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-30 - House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the criminal penalties for the possession of certain tetrahydrocannabinols under the Texas Controlled Substances Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the criminal penalties for the possession of certain tetrahydrocannabinols under the Texas Controlled Substances Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1759 (Y: 95 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#484 (Y: 108 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1759
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-29HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-28HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenatePassed as amended
2021-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-21SenateAmended
2021-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2021-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-04-28SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#484
2021-04-28HousePassed
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2593
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02593I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02593H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02593S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02593S3F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02593I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02593H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02593E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02593E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2593&RcdVtNo=484&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2021
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2593&RcdVtNo=1759&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021

Bill Comments

feedback