TX HB2590 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the foreclosure sale of property subject to an oil or gas lease.
Title
Relating to the foreclosure sale of property subject to an oil or gas lease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - HB 2590Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - HB 2590Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - HB 2590Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-02 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FORECLOSURES
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property