TX HB2586 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an annual audit of the independent organization certified for the ERCOT power region.
Title
Relating to an annual audit of the independent organization certified for the ERCOT power region.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#147 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#147 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#147 |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 1-Holland |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1252 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
AUDITS & AUDITORS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--General
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--General