TX HB2583 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the application of child support guidelines to net resources in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the application of child support guidelines to net resources in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-13HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2023-03-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback