TX HB2578 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the efficiency of and consolidation of powers and duties within the health and human services system.
Title
Relating to the efficiency of and consolidation of powers and duties within the health and human services system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - HB 2578Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-26 | House | House requests conference committee |
2015-05-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2015-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-27 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-04-27 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
ASSISTIVE & REHABILITATIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
AUDITS & AUDITORS
AUTISM & PERVASIVE DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS, TEXAS COUNCIL ON
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
OFFICE FOR THE PREVENTION OF DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
ASSISTIVE & REHABILITATIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
AUDITS & AUDITORS
AUTISM & PERVASIVE DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS, TEXAS COUNCIL ON
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
OFFICE FOR THE PREVENTION OF DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES