TX HB2577 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the light-duty motor vehicle purchase or lease incentive program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the light-duty motor vehicle purchase or lease incentive program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Amended RV#813 (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#813
2021-05-06HousePassed as amended
2021-05-06HouseAmended 1-Goodwin
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-05HouseAmended 1-C. Bell
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2577
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02577I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02577H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02577E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02577H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02577H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02577I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02577H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02577H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2577&RcdVtNo=813&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback