TX HB2571 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a trauma affected veterans clinical care and research center at The University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a trauma affected veterans clinical care and research center at The University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio.

Sponsors

Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Sen. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Sen. Pat Fallon [R]
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Eric Johnson [D]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Sen. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]
Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#498 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-03-23HouseRead first time
2017-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback