TX HB2569 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the dates a retail fireworks permit holder may sell fireworks to the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the dates a retail fireworks permit holder may sell fireworks to the public.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1046 (Y: 116 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1046
2021-05-13HousePassed
2021-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-12HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-27HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-23HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback