TX HB2566 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-08 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to newborn and infant hearing screenings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to newborn and infant hearing screenings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Passed RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-29HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB580 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback