TX HB2565 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Big Sky Municipal Utility District of Denton County and the Smiley Road Water Control and Improvement District; providing authority to issue bonds and impose fees and taxes.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Big Sky Municipal Utility District of Denton County and the Smiley Road Water Control and Improvement District; providing authority to issue bonds and impose fees and taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1789 (Y: 130 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BIG SKY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF DENTON COUNTY
SMILEY ROAD WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
SMILEY ROAD WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility