TX HB2556 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to excess wear and use waivers in connection with the lease of motor vehicles; providing a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to excess wear and use waivers in connection with the lease of motor vehicles; providing a civil penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1778 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback