TX HB2554 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 66-29)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation by a school district of a vocational education program to provide eligible high school students with vocational and educational training under a plan for the issuance of a high school diploma and the application of certain student-based allotments under the public school finance system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation by a school district of a vocational education program to provide eligible high school students with vocational and educational training under a plan for the issuance of a high school diploma and the application of certain student-based allotments under the public school finance system.

Sponsors

Rep. Gary Gates [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]
Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]
Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]
Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D]Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D]Sen. Bob Hall [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1108 (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenateNo action taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1108
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2554
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02554I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02554H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02554E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02554S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02554I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02554H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02554H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02554E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02554E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2554&RcdVtNo=1108&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback