TX HB2548 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inspection of municipal buildings during a declared disaster.
Title
Relating to the inspection of municipal buildings during a declared disaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB877 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - Effective immediately