TX HB2546 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the enforcement by the secretary of state of certain voter roll maintenance provisions; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the enforcement by the secretary of state of certain voter roll maintenance provisions; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback