TX HB2542 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to considering criminal history in employment decisions; providing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to considering criminal history in employment decisions; providing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |