TX HB2541 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-06 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-06 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of certain treatments for enrollees diagnosed with a terminal illness; authorizing administrative and civil penalties.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of certain treatments for enrollees diagnosed with a terminal illness; authorizing administrative and civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - HB 2541Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-01 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents