TX HB2538 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of certain tax revenue by certain municipalities and the authority of those municipalities to pledge that revenue for the payment of obligations related to hotel and convention center projects.
Title
Relating to the use of certain tax revenue by certain municipalities and the authority of those municipalities to pledge that revenue for the payment of obligations related to hotel and convention center projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
City Government
City Government--Finance
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
LAREDO, CITY OF
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
City Government
City Government--Finance
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
LAREDO, CITY OF
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy