TX HB2537 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring public schools to provide information to certain students on the availability of financial assistance for postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring public schools to provide information to certain students on the availability of financial assistance for postsecondary education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective immediately
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-23HouseRead first time
2017-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback