TX HB2535 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas Military Preparedness Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas Military Preparedness Commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1443 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback