TX HB2526 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to the notice required regarding the application of certain residential rental payments.
Title
Relating to the notice required regarding the application of certain residential rental payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-04-15 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-16 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |