TX HB2525 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to political expenditures made by a corporation or labor organization to finance the establishment and administration of a political committee.
Title
Relating to political expenditures made by a corporation or labor organization to finance the establishment and administration of a political committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-15 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-07 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-02 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-02 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Subjects
Corporations & Associations
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS