TX HB252 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing awareness of the dangers of exposing children to secondhand smoke.
Title
Relating to increasing awareness of the dangers of exposing children to secondhand smoke.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Tobacco Products
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Tobacco Products
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB252 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00252I.htm |