TX HB2517 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to suicide prevention in municipal jails.
Title
Relating to suicide prevention in municipal jails.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
SUICIDE
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
SUICIDE