TX HB2510 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Recommitted to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Recommitted to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of State Health Services, the provision of health services in this state, and the regulation of certain health-related occupations and activities.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of State Health Services, the provision of health services in this state, and the regulation of certain health-related occupations and activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] |
Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 18 by Schaefer (Y: 83 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 18 by Schaefer (Y: 49 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 17 by Schaefer (Y: 53 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 12 by Zerwas (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 8 by Howard (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 18 by Schaefer (Y: 49 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 17 by Schaefer (Y: 53 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 12 by Zerwas (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 8 by Howard (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to table fails |
2015-04-23 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to table fails |
2015-04-23 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2015-04-23 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2015-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-23 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment as amended withdrawn |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-21 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DIETITIANS ADVISORY BOARD
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
HEARING INSTRUMENT FITTERS AND DISPENSERS ADVISORY BOARD
Human Services
Human Services--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL PHYSICIST LICENSURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGY, TEXAS BOARD OF
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MIDWIVES ADVISORY BOARD
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
ORTHOTISTS AND PROSTHETISTS ADVISORY BOARD
PERFUSIONIST LICENSURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE
RESPIRATORY CARE, TEXAS BOARD OF
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS AND AUDIOLOGISTS ADVISORY BOARD
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
HEARING INSTRUMENT FITTERS AND DISPENSERS ADVISORY BOARD
Human Services
Human Services--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL PHYSICIST LICENSURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGY, TEXAS BOARD OF
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MIDWIVES ADVISORY BOARD
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
ORTHOTISTS AND PROSTHETISTS ADVISORY BOARD
PERFUSIONIST LICENSURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE
RESPIRATORY CARE, TEXAS BOARD OF
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS AND AUDIOLOGISTS ADVISORY BOARD
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills