TX HB2504 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed in the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to candidates nominated by convention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to candidates nominated by convention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1289 (Y: 77 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Johnson
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Rodríguez
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Rodríguez
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Rodríguez
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1289
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1; Article III, Section 35
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-Springer
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Elections
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2504
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02504I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02504H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02504E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02504S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02504F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2504&RcdVtNo=1289&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=45
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=46
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=47
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback