TX HB2500 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of solar energy property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of solar energy property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-10 - House - HB 2500Third Reading House (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 1/1/14
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenatePassed
2013-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2013-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2013-05-15SenateReported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-15SenateTestimony taken in subcommittee
2013-05-15SenateConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2013-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2013-05-14SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-13SenateReferred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
2013-05-10SenateReferred to Finance
2013-05-10SenateRead first time
2013-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-10HouseRecord vote
2013-05-10HousePassed
2013-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-12HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2013-03-12HouseRead first time
2013-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback