TX HB25 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a pilot program for providing services to certain women and children under the Medicaid medical transportation program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a pilot program for providing services to certain women and children under the Medicaid medical transportation program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1710 (Y: 114 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#401 (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#358 (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1710
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-16HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-16HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-16HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenatePassed
2019-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#401
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#358
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB25
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00025I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00025H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00025E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00025S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00025F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=358&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=401&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019

Bill Comments

feedback