TX HB2499 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the wearing of a personal flotation device while being towed behind a motorboat or while engaged in water sports in or on the wake of a motorboat; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the wearing of a personal flotation device while being towed behind a motorboat or while engaged in water sports in or on the wake of a motorboat; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#553 (Y: 78 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 2nd time RV#518 (Y: 74 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 2nd time RV#518 (Y: 74 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#553 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#518 |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |