TX HB2499 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of real property interests by navigation districts and port authorities.
Title
Relating to the disposition of real property interests by navigation districts and port authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Telecommunications
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Telecommunications