TX HB2497 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment and duties of the Texas 1836 Project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment and duties of the Texas 1836 Project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1650 (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#743 (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1650
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 West
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 West
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#743
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-04HouseAmended 5-C. Turner
2021-05-04HouseAmended 4-Slaton
2021-05-04HouseAmended 3-Slaton
2021-05-04HouseAmended 2-Parker
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Parker
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-16HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-16HouseRead first time
2021-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2497
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02497I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02497H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02497E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02497S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02497F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02497H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02497H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02497H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02497H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02497H25.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02497S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02497S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02497S2F3.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02497I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02497H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02497H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02497E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02497E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02497F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2497&RcdVtNo=743&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2497&RcdVtNo=1650&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=88
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=89
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=90

Bill Comments 750

feedback