TX HB2494 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the election of emergency services commissioners in certain emergency services districts.
Title
Relating to the election of emergency services commissioners in certain emergency services districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-16 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#297 |
2021-04-16 | House | Passed |
2021-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-16 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB774 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Elections--Candidates
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous