TX HB2486 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to restoration of the position of public employees when relieved of duty from the Texas military forces or a similar unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to restoration of the position of public employees when relieved of duty from the Texas military forces or a similar unit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#919 (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-05HouseAmended
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback