TX HB2476 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to discipline management in public schools.
Title
Relating to discipline management in public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Dora Olivo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts