TX HB2466 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the content of an application for Medicaid and coverage for certain services related to maternal depression under the Medicaid and child health plan programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the content of an application for Medicaid and coverage for certain services related to maternal depression under the Medicaid and child health plan programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1821 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#967 (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback